First Mercury Insurance Company v. Titanium Builders, LLC
Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: Titanium Builders, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00018
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 MOTION for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 2/28/2018 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stella Szantova Giordano; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edwin L. Doernberger. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorneys on 4/17/2017 (cjs).
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gary S. Kull; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexa J. Nasta Schmid. (BG) NEF regenerated to Attorneys Kull and Nasta Schmid on 2/6/2017. (rh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Mercury Insurance Company v. Titanium Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary S. Kull
Represented By: Scott J. Landa
Represented By: Alexa J. Nasta Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titanium Builders, LLC
Represented By: William J. Behrmann
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?