Scott v. Thru Tubing Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeremy Scott
Defendant: Thru Tubing Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00037
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 18 Motion for Unopposed Limited Release From Stay. (BG)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 16 Motion to Stay. Parties shall submit status report to the court by 8/1/2017. (BG)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David B. Jordan. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney on 5/18/2017 (cjs).
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Saba H. Alvi. (BG) NEF regenerated to Attorney Saba H. Alvi. (rh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Thru Tubing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Scott
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thru Tubing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Saba H. Alvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?