White Bird Solgado v. North Dakota, State of
Case Number: 1:2017cv00056
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: This court shall not issue a certificate of appealability to petitioner. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 12/6/2017. Regenerated to 8th Circuit. (rh)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; denying 2 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) (ZE) Distributed on 11/7/2017. (rh)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Clerk's office shall seal attachment 2 to petitioner's 16 Letter as it contains sensitive personal information. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 9/18/2017 (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Bird Solgado v. North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?