The Woodmont Company et al v. LaSalle Shopping Center, LLC et al
Case Number: 1:2017cv00073
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 3/9/2021 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Previously set for 9/09/2020) (BG)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte granting in part and denying in part 77 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 80 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (MK)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 9/9/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Previously set for 10/15/2019) (BG)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Status Conference re: Discovery Dispute set for 9/10/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/18/2018. Discovery Motions due by 9/18/2018. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/18/2018. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/31/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 5/18/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2018. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 2/16/2018. Threshold Motions due by 7/20/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Woodmont Company et al v. LaSalle Shopping Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?