Skellham et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark A. Skellham and Belinda L. Skellham
Defendant: United States of America, Tammy Dunlop, Triple R and Sons LLC and Joe Greaves
Case Number: 1:2017cv00091
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. The stay is lifted. Discovery due by 7/22/2019. Discovery Motions due by 7/22/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/6/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/7/2019. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 32 Motion to Stay Action Due to Lapse of Appropriations (BG)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The 29 MOTION for Hearing is deemed moot and 28 MOTION to Vacate is granted. Discovery due by 6/17/2019. Discovery Motions due by 6/17/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Wit ness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 2/19/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Trial REset for 3/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (FPT and trial previously set 1/29/2019 and 2/12/2019, respectively). (BG)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 26 Motion to Vacate 21 Scheduling Order. (ZE)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skellham et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Skellham
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Represented By: Tyler Johnson Siewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda L. Skellham
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Represented By: Tyler Johnson Siewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple R and Sons LLC
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Greaves
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?