Power Energy Corporation et al v. Hess Bakken II, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Power Energy Corporation, Altschuld Oil, L.L.C., Copperhead Corporation, Strata Resources, Inc., Michael S. Johnson, Michael T. Fitzmaurice, Patrick L. Butz and Jacques F. Butz
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investment II, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00093
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2020. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The 46 MOTION Extension to Deadlines is granted. Discovery due by 7/15/2020. Discovery Motions due by 7/15/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/25/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5 /26/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 6/15/2020. Threshold Motions due by 8/25/2020. The final pretrial conference set for 9/29/20 and trial set for 10/20/2020 are canceled pending further order of the court. A Status Conference is set for 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 5/5/2020 to correct date of final pretrial conference. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (GD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Energy Corporation et al v. Hess Bakken II, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Energy Corporation
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altschuld Oil, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copperhead Corporation
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strata Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick L. Butz
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques F. Butz
Represented By: Charles L. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investment II, L.L.C.
Represented By: Anthony J. Ford
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?