Envy Gentlemen's Club v. Minot, City of

Plaintiff: Envy Gentlemen's Club
Defendant: Minot, City of
Case Number: 1:2017cv00103
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Parties shall submit a status report by 2/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss and staying the case pending further order of the court. (BG)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re Discovery Deadlines, Trial, and Final Pretrial Conference by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Envy Gentlemen's Club v. Minot, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Envy Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: William J. Delmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minot, City of
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?