Tealeh v. Ward County et al
Plaintiff: Flomo Tealeh
Defendant: Ward County, Sandra Richter, Melissa Bliss and John Does 1-200
Case Number: 1:2017cv00105
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The final pretrial conference set for 8/13/2019 and jury trial set for 9/04/2019 are cancelled. They shall be rescheduled as necessary at a later date. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Status Conference re: Discovery Dispute set for 2/14/2019 at 1:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 31 replaced on 1/31/2019 to correct date in order) (cjs). Regenerated and distributed on 1/31/2019 (cjs).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, (Discovery due by 2/19/2019, Discovery Motions due by 2/19/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr., Jury Trial set for 9/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (GD) Distributed on 10/1/2018. (rh)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/14/2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 3/8/2018 (cjs).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Status Conference re: Discovery Dispute set for 3/6/2018 at 3:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 2/20/2018 (cjs).
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 8/10/2017. (cd)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE) Distributed on 7/12/2017 (cd).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tealeh v. Ward County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flomo Tealeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?