Slawson Exploration Company, Inc. v. Nine Point Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.
Defendant: Nine Point Energy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00106
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (NH)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Adopting Stipulation re 42 Stipulation filed by Slawson Exploration Company, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jayvan E. Mitchell; granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher M. Dressel; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Albert L. Hogan III. (BG) NEF regenerated to Attorneys Mitchell, Dressel, and Hogan on 11/13/2017. (rh)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc. v. Nine Point Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slawson Exploration Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Point Energy, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell D. Armstrong
Represented By: Sarah E. Kuntz
Represented By: Brian D. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?