Berrisford v. Southwinds Inspection Corp.
Plaintiff: Carlo Berrisford
Defendant: Southwinds Inspection Corp.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00117
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting 54 Joint Proposed Revised Scheduling Plan. Discovery due by 1/11/2019. Discovery Motions due by 1/11/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/14/2018. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Repo rts due by 10/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 8/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. Jury Trial REset for 9/10/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (FPT and Trial previously set for 10/31/2018 and 11/13/2018) (BG)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 46 Motion to Stay of Discovery. (ZE)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Courtney Warmington. (ZE)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrisford v. Southwinds Inspection Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Berrisford
Represented By: John A. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwinds Inspection Corp.
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?