Red River Supply, Inc. v. National Oil Well Varco, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Red River Supply, Inc.
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco, L.P., National Oilwell Varco, Inc. and National Oilwell Varco Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00126
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 47 Stipulation. Discovery due by 1/11/2019. Discovery Motions due by 1/11/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/11/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 2/8/2019. Discovery depositions of experts due by 3/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2019. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gail L. Wurtzler. (BG) Regenerated on 6/25/2018 (cjs). (Main Document 34 replaced on 6/25/2018 to reflect admission was granted) (cjs). Regenerated on 6/25/2018 (cjs).
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Kirk Mueller; granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander D. White. (ZE) NEF regenerated to PHV attorneys on 5/22/2018 (cjs).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/29/2017 to correct date of Order. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red River Supply, Inc. v. National Oil Well Varco, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red River Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco, L.P.
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco Holdings LLC
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?