Peterson v. Murex Petroleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Adam Peterson
Defendant: Murex Petroleum Corporation and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2017cv00165
Filed: August 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, dismisses plaintiffs claims and defendants cross-claims with prejudice and without fees or costs to any of the parties. As this disposes of what remains of this case, a final judgment shall be entered reflecting a dismissal with prejudice of plaintiffs claims and defendants cross-claims and dismissal without prejudice of the third-party complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part Murex's 157 motion for the court not to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over its third-party complaint against WISCO and dismissing without prejudice its third-party complaint against WISCO. (BG)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 160 Request for Rule 16 Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (BG)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER: The jury trial on plaintiff's claims set for 4/29/2019 is cancelled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (BG)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part 128 Motion in Limine; granting in part 131 Motion in Limine. (BG)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re upcoming Final Pretrial Conference. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER requiring compliance with Local Rule Re Filing of Deposition Transcripts. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER adopting 76 Stipulation Amend Scheduling Order. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/30/2018. Defendant(s) and Third-Party Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/31/2018. Third-Party Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/31/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey H. Cluff. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney on 2/13/2018. (cd)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew R. Heape. (BG) Regenerated NEF to Attorney Heape on 12/28/2017. (rh)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 11:00 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Murex Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Peterson
Represented By: Joshua K. Conaway
Represented By: Damian J. Huettl
Represented By: Scott R. Miller
Represented By: Carlos E. Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murex Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Gordon H. Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?