Johnsrud et al v. Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Co. LP
Plaintiff: Mark Johnsrud and MariBeth Johnsrud
Defendant: Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Co. LP
Counter_claimant: Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Co. LP
Counter_defendant: MariBeth Johnsrud and Mark Johnsrud
Case Number: 1:2017cv00209
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The parties shall submit a status report by 9/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER adopting 52 Stipulation Regarding Outstanding Case Deadlines. All outstanding pretrial deadlines are stayed pending further order of the court. Parties shall submit a status report to the court in 30 days. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER, ( Settlement Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Adopting Stipulation re 45 Stipulation filed by Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Co. LP by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER amending pretrial deadlines: Discovery due by 7/31/2019. Discovery Motions due by 7/31/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/23/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/23/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/20/2019. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 3:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnsrud et al v. Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Co. LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnsrud
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Kyra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MariBeth Johnsrud
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Kyra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Co. LP
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Co. LP
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: MariBeth Johnsrud
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Kyra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mark Johnsrud
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Kyra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?