Trinity Hospitals, Inc. et al v. The Markham Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trinity Hospitals, Inc. and Trinity Health, Inc.
Defendant: The Markham Group, LLC, Bruce Sinclair, Christopher Todd Coon and Doe No. 1
Case Number: 1:2017cv00237
Filed: November 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file another status report with the court by 7/12/2020. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file another status report with the court by March 20, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file a status report by 1/17/2020. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file a status report by 11/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 MOTION to Continue and 71 MOTION for Extension of Time. The pretrial deadlines are suspended pending further order of the Court. The final pretrial conference set for 1/21/2020 and trial set for 2/3/2020 are cancelled. Plaintiffs shall file a status report by 7/12/2019. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Unsealing Documents by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (ZE)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re Disclosure of Membership by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew B. Brantingham; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meghan L. DesLauriers. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorneys on 11/8/2017 (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Hospitals, Inc. et al v. The Markham Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Brantingham
Represented By: Meghan L. DesLauriers
Represented By: Randall S. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Health, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Brantingham
Represented By: Meghan L. DesLauriers
Represented By: Randall S. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Markham Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Todd Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?