Barron v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Adam Barron
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00245
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Slope
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/13/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Jury Trial REset for 4/26/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (FPT and trial previously set for 6/05/2019 and 6/17/2019)(BG) (Main Document 30 replaced on 5/13/2019 to correct caption) (am). NEF regenerated on 5/13/2019 (am).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Paoli. (BG) Regenerated NEF to Attorney Paoli on 12/22/2017. (rh)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Barron
Represented By: Cortney S. LeNeave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Daniel A. Haws
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?