Guardian Flight LLC v. Godfread et al
Plaintiff: Guardian Flight LLC
Defendant: Jon Godfread and Wayne Stenehjem
Case Number: 1:2018cv00007
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. (MM)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 12 Stipulated Scheduling Order. The scheduling conference set for 3/21/2018 is canceled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua L. Fuchs (ZE) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney on 1/16/2018 (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardian Flight LLC v. Godfread et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardian Flight LLC
Represented By: Joshua L. Fuchs
Represented By: Monte Lane Rogneby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Godfread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Stenehjem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?