Pietsch et al v. Ward County et al
Plaintiff: John Pietsch, Arlan Irwin, Ward County Farm Bureau and Ward County Farmers Union
Defendant: Ward County and The Board of County Commissioners for Ward County, North Dakota
Case Number: 1:2018cv00023
Filed: February 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Bench Trial REset for 5/4/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (FPT and bench trial previously set for 11/26/2019 and 12/10/2019) (BG)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2019. Bench Trial REset for 12/10/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days, previously set for 8/20/2019). Final Pretrial Conference REset for 11/26/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (previously set for 8/07/2019). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 MOTION to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline and 21 MOTION to Set a Status Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2019. Status Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 3:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pietsch et al v. Ward County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pietsch
Represented By: Franklin J. Falen
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Slattery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlan Irwin
Represented By: Franklin J. Falen
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Slattery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward County Farm Bureau
Represented By: Franklin J. Falen
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Slattery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward County Farmers Union
Represented By: Franklin J. Falen
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Slattery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward County
Represented By: Lawrence E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of County Commissioners for Ward County, North Dakota
Represented By: Lawrence E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?