Pinke v. Kuntz et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Lynn Pinke
Defendant: Shawn Kuntz, Curt Meidinger, Melissa Kaseman-Wolf, Bruce Herr, Trina Schilling and Dynette Ketterling
Case Number: 1:2018cv00024
Filed: February 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McIntosh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting 37 Stipulation. Threshold Motions due by 8/2/2019. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting in part 31 Stipulation re Amended Scheduling Discovery/Plan. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 5/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/3/2019. D efendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/7/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/1/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before C hief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (FPT and bench trial previously set for 8/20/2019 and 9/04/2018, respectively) (BG)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Wishek, North Dakota before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinke v. Kuntz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Lynn Pinke
Represented By: Micheal A. Mulloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Kuntz
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner-Kaufman
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Meidinger
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner-Kaufman
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Kaseman-Wolf
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner-Kaufman
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Herr
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner-Kaufman
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trina Schilling
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner-Kaufman
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynette Ketterling
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner-Kaufman
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?