Direct Electric LLC v. Seeman et al

Plaintiff: Direct Electric LLC
Defendant: Joseph John Seeman, Diana Andrea Naomi Seeman, Chris Riebsomer, Seeman's Electric, LLC, Riebsomer Electric, LLC and R & S Automation and Electric, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00039
Filed: February 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER adopting 43 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Direct Electric LLC. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting 31 Stipulation and Amending Pretrial Deadlines. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2019, except amendments re claims for punitive damages due by 5/10/2019. Discovery due by 6/10/2019. Discovery Motions due by 6/10/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/15/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/19/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 5/10/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 5/10/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Plaintiff and defendant LLCs shall disclose the citizenship of their respective members by 6/18/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the conference call. (ZE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Direct Electric LLC v. Seeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Electric LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Prindiville
Represented By: Richard RW Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph John Seeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Andrea Naomi Seeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Riebsomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seeman's Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riebsomer Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & S Automation and Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?