United States of America v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bruce E. Johnson, Elizabeth L. Johnson, North Dakota Office of State Tax Commissioner and Ward County Treasurer
Case Number: 1:2018cv00040
Filed: March 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 8/31/2020. Discovery Motions due by 8/31/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/28/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosur es and Reports due by 10/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2020. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/14/2021 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 4/26/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (4 days) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. FPT Conference and Jury Trial previously set for 10/13/2020 and 10/27/2020. (BG)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 27 Motion to Compel. (BG)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Discovery Motions due by 5/1/2020. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 2/5/2020. (rh)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Defendant Bruce and Elizabeth Johnsons' responses to all outstanding discovery requests due by 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 3/1/2020. Discovery Motions due by 3/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. Final Pretrial Conferen ce REset for 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 10/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (FPT and jury trial previously set for 4/27/2020 and 5/12/2020) (BG) Distributed on 11/7/2019 (cjs).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Discovery due by 11/18/2019. Discovery Motions due by 11/18/2019. Status Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM CST/11:00 AM EST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 10/23/2019. (rh)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/13/2018 to correct signature block) (cjs). Regenerated on 12/13/2018 (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julian T. A. Lee(Designation USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce E. Johnson
Represented By: Samuel G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth L. Johnson
Represented By: Samuel G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Office of State Tax Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?