Adaskes v. Boyd and Company Construction

Plaintiff: Jamie L. Adaskes
Defendant: Boyd and Company Construction
Case Number: 1:2018cv00076
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 28, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 12, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John R. Hinrichs. (BG) Distributed to attorney on 4/12/2018. (cd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adaskes v. Boyd and Company Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie L. Adaskes
Represented By: John R. Hinrichs
Represented By: Steven Francis Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd and Company Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?