Cude v. Stark, County of

Plaintiff: Michael P. Cude
Defendant: Stark, County of
Case Number: 1:2018cv00113
Filed: May 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 10:30 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian J. Lawler. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cude v. Stark, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Cude
Represented By: Brian J. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stark, County of
Represented By: Mitchell D. Armstrong
Represented By: Brian D. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?