McGinnis v. Hines et al
Plaintiff: Neil McGinnis
Defendant: Doctor Bereke, Paul Laney and Pat Hines
Case Number: 1:2018cv00149
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Neil McGinnis, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Neil McGinnis. Show Cause Response and objections to Report and Recommendation due by 9/17/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/22/2018 to correct order date) (cjs). Regenerated on 8/22/2018 (cjs). Distributed on 8/22/2018 (cjs).
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to document: #2 PLRA Packet by Neil McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to document: #2 PLRA Packet by Neil McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr., as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. no longer assigned as presiding judge(cjs). Distributed on 8/7/2018 (cjs).
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Neil McGinnis. (cjs)
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Neil McGinnis (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (rh)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Neil McGinnis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/9/2018. (rh)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Neil McGinnis. (rh)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Court, #3 Letters to Court and Judge Miller, #4 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #5 Mailing Envelopes)(rh)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Neil McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Resident Transaction Details)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinnis v. Hines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Bereke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?