Todd v. North Dakota Department of Human Services

Plaintiff: Mary Todd
Defendant: North Dakota Department of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00150
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss filed by North Dakota Department of Human Services. (Meyer, Nici)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss by North Dakota Department of Human Services. (Meyer, Nici)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Sagsveen on behalf of North Dakota Department of Human Services (Sagsveen, Matthew)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting #5 Stipulation filed by North Dakota Department of Human Services by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. North Dakota Department of Human Services answer or other responsive pleading due by 8/27/2018. (ZE)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION Scheduling Order for Pleadings by North Dakota Department of Human Services. (Meyer, Nici)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nici S. Meyer on behalf of All Defendants (Meyer, Nici)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Todd. North Dakota Department of Human Services served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018 (Larson, Samuel)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to North Dakota Department of Human Services. (cjs)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Dakota Department of Human Services (Filing fee $400, receipt number 118001248) filed by Mary Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Last Will and Testament, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. North Dakota Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Department of Human Services
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Represented By: Nici S. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Todd
Represented By: Rene H. Reixach
Represented By: Samuel G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?