Conner et al v. Topchiy et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Conner and Sandra Conner
Defendant: Hennadiy Topchiy, Roe Business Entities, TIA Trucking and Does I-X
Petitioner: Sparta Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00152
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Kidder
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene by Sparta Insurance Company. (Hoy, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by TIA Trucking, Hennadiy Topchiy to Kidder County District Court of Filing of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal dated 7/16/18)(Flom, Joel)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TIA Trucking, Hennadiy Topchiy from Kidder County District Court, case number Unknown. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 118001251 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Affidavits of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Answer of Hennadiy Topchiy and TIA Trucking, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner et al v. Topchiy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennadiy Topchiy
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Represented By: Zachary C. Burmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Business Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIA Trucking
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Represented By: Zachary C. Burmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Conner
Represented By: Eric Hinckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Conner
Represented By: Eric Hinckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sparta Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert G. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?