Webster v. Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C.
Plaintiff: Katie Webster
Defendant: Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00164
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 10/17/2018 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 10/17/2018 at 11:00 AM) (BG)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C..(Poncin, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C.. (cjs)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katie Webster. Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. served on 8/7/2018, answer due 9/14/2018 (Lyons, Thomas)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/4/2018. (js)
August 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. answer due 9/14/2018. (cjs)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER GRANTING re #7 Stipulation filed by Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension to Respond by Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C.. (Poncin, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Poncin on behalf of Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. (Poncin, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Katie Webster. (cjs)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katie Webster. Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. served on 7/7/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 (Lyons, Thomas)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Katie Webster. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/16/2018. (rh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. (rh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 118001309) filed by Katie Webster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schweigert Klemin & McBride, P.C.
Represented By: Michael S. Poncin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Webster
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?