Perez et al v. Nordhagen et al
Plaintiff: Luis Oliveras Medina and Miguel Perez
Defendant: Does 1 through 40, Melvin Nordhagen and Black Hills Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00167
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (am)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Miguel Perez, Luis Oliveras Medina.(MM)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luis Oliveras Medina, Miguel Perez (deGuzman, Katherine)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Boris Treyzon. (GD) Regenerated to PHV attorney on 8/28/2018 (cjs).
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Boris Treyzon (Filing fee $150, receipt number 118001398) by Luis Oliveras Medina, Miguel Perez. (cjs)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas A. Rochen (GD) Regenerated NEF to Attorney Rochen on 8/21/2018. (rh)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine deGuzman (GD) Distributed to PHV attorney on 8/21/2018 (cjs).
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Douglas A. Rochen (Filing fee $150, receipt number 118001377) by Luis Oliveras Medina, Miguel Perez. (cjs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katherine deGuzman (Filing fee $150, receipt number 118001372) by Luis Oliveras Medina, Miguel Perez. (cjs)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Black Hills Trucking, Inc., Does 1 through 40, Melvin Nordhagen. (as)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Black Hills Trucking, Inc., Does 1 through 40, Melvin Nordhagen (Filing fee $400, receipt number 318000465) filed by Miguel Perez, Luis Oliveras Medina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Nordhagen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Nordhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hills Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Oliveras Medina
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Keeffe
Represented By: Douglas A. Rochen
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Represented By: Katherine deGuzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Perez
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Keeffe
Represented By: Douglas A. Rochen
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Represented By: Katherine deGuzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?