United States et al v. Western Surety Company
Plaintiff: United States and Thomas Industrial Coatings
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00174
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McLean
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 10/12/2018 is cancelled. It shall be rescheduled at a later date and time. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 03:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Western Surety Company.(Kovarik, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Surety Company identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for Western Surety Company.. (Kovarik, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Sanderson on behalf of Western Surety Company (Sanderson, Paul)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. Kovarik on behalf of Western Surety Company (Kovarik, Nicholas)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Thomas Industrial Coatings, United States. (rh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Thomas Industrial Coatings. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/11/2018. (cjs)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to United States. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/11/2018. (cjs)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas Industrial Coatings. (Hanson, Mark)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Western Surety Company. (cjs)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Thomas Industrial Coatings. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/29/2018. (cjs)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to United States. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/29/2018. (cjs)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Surety Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 318000485) filed by United States, Thomas Industrial Coatings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit 2-Subcontract Payment Bond, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States et al v. Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Industrial Coatings
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Nicholas D. Kovarik
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?