Matthews v. Braun
Petitioner: Antonio Raheem Matthews
Respondent: Colby Braun
Case Number: 1:2018cv00175
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Colby Braun. (am)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Colby Braun. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/23/2018. (as)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition filed by Colby Braun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.Registry of Actions, State v. Matthews, Grand Forks County Case No. 18 2013 CR 02076, #2 Exhibit 2.Judgment of Conviction, State v. Matthews, Grand Forks County Case No. 18 2013-CR-02076, #3 Exhibit 3-ND Supreme Court Docket 20140390, #4 Exhibit 4-State v. Matthews, 2015 ND 119, #5 Exhibit 5.Registry of Actions, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18 2015 CV-01212, #6 Exhibit 6.Order, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18-2015-CV-01212, #7 Exhibit 7-ND Supreme Court Docket 20160037, #8 Exhibit 8-Matthews v. State, 2016 ND 123, #9 Exhibit 9- Registry of Actions, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18 2016 CV-02073, #10 Exhibit 10-Order, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18-2016-CV-02073, #11 Exhibit 11-Registry of Actions, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18 2016 CV-02134, #12 Exhibit 12-Order, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18 2016-CV-02134, #13 Exhibit 13-Registry of Actions, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18 2017 CV 03040, #14 Exhibit 14-Order, Matthews v. State, Grand Forks County Case No. 18-2017-CV-03040, #15 Exhibit 15-ND Supreme Court Docket 20180060, #16 Exhibit 16-Matthews v. State, 2018 ND 149)(Mahoney, Michael) Modified on 10/9/2018 to add exhibit numbers (cjs).
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss 2254 Petition by Colby Braun. (Mahoney, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER: The Clerk's office shall seal exhibit 2 to #10 Supplement as it contains sensitive personal information. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 9/28/2018 (cjs).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying #11 Motion to Deny Order to Answer. (GD) Distributed on 9/28/2018 (cjs).
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION For Court to Deny Order for Respondent to File Answer by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Direct Assignment, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Mailing Envelope)(am)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to document: #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Pages 72 and 73, #2 *SEALED* GF PD - Investigative Supplement, #3 GF PD - Photo Log, #4 Transcript Page 114, #5 GF PD - Investigative Supplement, #6 GF PD - Investigative Supplement, #7 Mailing Envelope)(am) Modified on 9/28/2018 to seal attachment 2 pursuant to Order at 13 (cjs).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD) Distributed on 9/18/2018 (cjs).
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Antonio Matthews (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (am)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER vacating #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and deeming as moot #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 8/22/2018 (cjs).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *VACATED* ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (GD) Distributed on 8/20/2018 (cjs). Vacated per Order at #6 on 8/22/2018 (cjs).
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Antonio Matthews (Attachments: #1 Response Sent by Clerk's Office) (kmk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Antonio Raheem Matthews. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/31/2018. (cjs)
August 17, 2018 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 118001371 (cjs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Raheem Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Raheem Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colby Braun
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?