Bank of the West v. Cooper et al

Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Defendant: All other persons unknown claiming any right, title, estate, interest or lien in the real estate described herein, Julie A. Cooper and Randall L. Cooper
Case Number: 1:2018cv00187
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim #4 by Bank of the West.(Bender, Lawrence)
October 31, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Vyvyan on behalf of Bank of the West (Vyvyan, Mark)
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/16/2019. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/16/2019. (am)
October 30, 2018 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 6/9/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days). (BG)
October 30, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 30, 2018 7 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 8/1/2019. Expert disclosures due as follows: parties making affirmative claims by 9/2/2019; responses by 11/1/2019; and rebuttals by 12/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 6/3/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2019. (BG)
October 30, 2018 6 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2018. (BG)
October 22, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
October 19, 2018 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM of Randall L. Cooper against Bank of the West by Julie A. Cooper, Randall L. Cooper.(Bye, Jonathan)
September 13, 2018 3 AFFIDAVIT of Filing and Service re Notice Regarding Removal by Julie A. Cooper, Randall L. Cooper. (Bye, Jonathan)
September 13, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julie A. Cooper, Randall L. Cooper re #1 Notice of Removal, (Bye, Jonathan)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Julie A. Cooper, Randall L. Cooper from Dunn County District Court, case number Unknown. Filing fee $400, receipt number 118001474 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dunn County Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the West v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All other persons unknown claiming any right, title, estate, interest or lien in the real estate described herein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Cooper
Represented By: Christopher M. Proczko
Represented By: Jonathan Millea Bye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall L. Cooper
Represented By: Christopher M. Proczko
Represented By: Jonathan Millea Bye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Mark W. Vyvyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?