Hoglund et al v. Kautter et al

Plaintiff: Christine Joan Hoglund and Craig Douglas Hoglund
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Dana (Hill) Fairchild, David J. Kautter and Doreen Peterson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00189
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2018 14 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(am) Distributed on 11/13/2018 (am).
November 13, 2018 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Dana (Hill) Fairchild, Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter, Doreen Peterson. (am)
November 9, 2018 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Doreen Peterson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/23/2018. (rh)
November 9, 2018 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to David J. Kautter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/23/2018. (rh)
November 9, 2018 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Internal Revenue Service. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/23/2018. (rh)
November 9, 2018 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dana (Hill) Fairchild. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/23/2018. (rh)
November 9, 2018 8 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. (GD)
November 8, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Certificate of Service by Dana (Hill) Fairchild, Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter, Doreen Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nygaard, Gretchen)
October 9, 2018 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Craig Douglas Hoglund. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/16/2018. (am)
October 9, 2018 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Christine Joan Hoglund. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/16/2018. (am) Modified on 10/9/2018 to remove and correct filer (am).
September 17, 2018 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Craig Douglas Hoglund. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/1/2018. (am)
September 17, 2018 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Christine Joan Hoglund. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/1/2018. (am)
September 17, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter, Dana (Hill) Fairchild, Doreen Peterson, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (am) Modified on 9/18/2018 to add additional defendants. (as)
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, David J. Kautter (Filing fee $400, receipt number 118001491) filed by Craig Douglas Hoglund, Christine Joan Hoglund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoglund et al v. Kautter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Gretchen Ellen Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana (Hill) Fairchild
Represented By: Gretchen Ellen Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Kautter
Represented By: Gretchen Ellen Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Peterson
Represented By: Gretchen Ellen Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Joan Hoglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Douglas Hoglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?