Ocker v. Quality Mat Company of North Dakota, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Charles C. Ocker
Defendant: Quality Mat Company of North Dakota, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00198
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland as presiding judge and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. as referral judge for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. is no longer assigned as presiding judge to the case. (am)
October 23, 2018 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Charles C. Ocker. (am)
October 23, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles C. Ocker. Quality Mat Company of North Dakota, L.L.C. waiver sent 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Weir, H.) Modified on 10/24/2018 to add answer due information. (as)
October 22, 2018 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Charles C. Ocker. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/29/2018. (cjs)
October 2, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Quality Mat Company of North Dakota, L.L.C. (cjs)
October 2, 2018 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Charles C. Ocker. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/16/2018. (cjs)
October 2, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Quality Mat Company of North Dakota, L.L.C. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000011) filed by Charles C. Ocker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocker v. Quality Mat Company of North Dakota, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. Ocker
Represented By: H. Patrick Weir, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan B. Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Mat Company of North Dakota, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?