Scarberry v. Lenoir et al

Plaintiff: Jacob E. Lee Scarberry
Defendant: Frank Landeis, Standin Rock Agency, Justin Lenoir, Brian Clouston and David Lawrence
Case Number: 1:2018cv00199
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 13 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to HACTC and Jacob E. Lee Scarberry re #11 Amended Order (am)
November 5, 2018 14 COMPLAINT against Brian Clouston, Frank Landeis, David Lawrence, Justin Lenoir filed by Jacob E. Lee Scarberry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(am) Modified on 11/7/2018 to remove Standin Rock Agency from the docket text (lf).
November 5, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 11/6/2018 (am).
November 5, 2018 11 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacob E. Lee Scarberry. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 11/6/2018 to HACTC and Jacob E. Lee Scarberry (am).
October 25, 2018 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jacob E. Lee Scarberry. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
October 23, 2018 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jacob E. Lee Scarberry. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
October 16, 2018 8 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to HACTC and Jacob Scarberry re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (am)
October 16, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (GD) Distributed to HACTC and Jacob Scarberry on 10/16/2018 (am).
October 15, 2018 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jacob E. Lee Scarberry. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/29/2018. (rh)
October 15, 2018 5 AMENDED PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Notices of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)
October 15, 2018 4 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacob E. Lee Scarberry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
October 4, 2018 3 PLRA Packet. (rh)
October 4, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacob E. Lee Scarberry. (Attachments: #1 Inmate History Report, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rh) Modified on 10/16/2018 to terminate Motion(am).
October 4, 2018 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarberry v. Lenoir et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Landeis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standin Rock Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Lenoir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Clouston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob E. Lee Scarberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?