Lumley v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Tracy Lumley
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00202
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
November 14, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to SSA served on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018; Social Security Administration served on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Temanson, Paul)
November 6, 2018 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Tracy Lumley. (rh)
October 31, 2018 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (cjs)
October 29, 2018 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tracy Lumley. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/5/2018. (cjs)
October 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (am)
October 11, 2018 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tracy Lumley. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/25/2018. (am)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000051) filed by Tracy Lumley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumley v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lumley
Represented By: Paul A. Temanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?