Cook et al v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Byron J. Cook and Jeffrey D. Cook
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, XTO Holdings, LLC and XTO Energy Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00203
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Ann Huckfeldt on behalf of XTO Energy Inc, XTO Holdings, LLC (Huckfeldt, Christina)
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/12/2019. (cjs)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2020 (3 days) at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 9/26/2019. Discovery Motions due by 9/26/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/25/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 09/12/2019. Expert Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 10/29/2019. Threshold Motions due by 4/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2019.(GD) Regenerated and modified on 10/30/2018 to correct scheduling date. (cjs).
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2018. (GD)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/19/2018 to correct caption) (am). Regenerated on 10/19/2018 (am).
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by XTO Energy Inc, XTO Holdings, LLC.(Bender, Lawrence)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hess Corporation for Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC.. (Forster, Paul)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC from Mountrail District Court. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000055, filed by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Removal (Michael Allen), #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit E - Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy Inc
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron J. Cook
Represented By: Erich M. Grant
Represented By: Jon W. Backes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Cook
Represented By: Erich M. Grant
Represented By: Jon W. Backes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?