Bridges v. Bertsch
Petitioner: John C. Bridges
Respondent: USA and Leann Bertsch
Case Number: 1:2018cv00219
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying #20 Motion for Leave to Resolve Court Document Confirmation and Mailing Issues. (BG) Distributed on 12/19/2018. (rh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Resolve Court Document Confirmation and Mailing Issues by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Example of envelope stamp, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 Letter from John C. Bridges (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (cjs)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying #15 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (BG) Distributed on 11/27/2018. (rh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT (Pages 5 and 6) to document: #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT (to Add to Exhibits J1, J2 and J3) to document: #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Leann Bertsch. (am)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Leann Bertsch. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/23/2018. (am)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by John C. Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jesus Christ Beelzebub, #2 Mailing Envelope)(am) Distributed on 11/9/2018 (am).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State). Response due by 1/25/2019. (BG) Distributed on 11/9/2018. (rh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Order to Answer by Leann Bertsch. (Mahoney, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SUBSTITUTING NAMED RESPONDENT AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 11/6/2018. (rh)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 10/31/2018 (cjs).
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John C. Bridges. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/13/2018. (rm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Colorado, Case Number 1:18-cv-02683. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Petitioner is challenging the convictions and sentence imposed by the State of North Dakota. Under these circumstances, the Court finds that the State of North Dakota or the North Dakota Department of Corrections is Petitioner's "true custodian" in conjunction with Petitioner's challenge to the legality of his state court convictions. See Holder, 749 F. Supp.2d at 647. "A court may sua sponte cure jurisdictional and venue defects by transferring a suit under the federal transfer statutes, 28 U.S.C. 1406 (a) and 1631, when it is in the interest of justice." Trujillo v. Williams, 465 F.3d 1210, 1222 (10th Cir. 2006). The Court finds that it is appropriate and in the interest of justice to transfer this habeas action to the federal district court in North Dakota. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the clerk of the court transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/23/2018. (evana, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Inmate Statement by John C. Bridges. (cmadr, ) Modified on 10/30/2018 to correct text. (rm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) filed by John C. Bridges.(cmadr, ) Modified on 10/30/2018 to change event from complaint to Motion. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. Bertsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leann Bertsch
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John C. Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?