Knicely v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Plaintiff: Donna Knicely
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00221
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:252
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 5/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days). (BG)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Discovery Motions due by 8/23/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/3/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/3/2019. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 8/2/2019. Discovery depositions of experts due by 9/06/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/25/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2019, except amendments re punitive damage due by 4/30/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 3/29/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2019.(BG)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/7/2018. (BG)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A..(Sawers, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A... (Sawers, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M. Sawers on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Sawers, Michael)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Knicely. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018 (Holyfield, Tyler)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (am) (Main Document 2 replaced to correct defendant's name on 10/30/2018) (am). Regenerated on 10/30/2018 (am). Modified on 10/30/2018 (am).
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000126) filed by Donna Knicely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knicely v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Knicely
Represented By: Tyler Holyfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Michael M. Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?