Dopita v. SM Fencing & Energy Services

Plaintiff: Cameron Dopita
Defendant: SM Fencing & Energy Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00223
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED ORDER re #11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SM Fencing & Energy Services by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD) (Main Document 23 replaced on 12/14/2018 to add 'Amended' to the document. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (kmk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cameron Dopita. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/21/2018. (cjs)
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 3/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days). (BG)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Discovery Motions due by 7/15/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/9/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 6/3/2019. Threshold Motions due by 6/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2019. (BG)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/14/2018. (BG)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 12/14/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Conference previously set for 12/14/2018 at 11:00 AM) (BG)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #11 Motion to Strike. (GD)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to SM Fencing & Energy Services. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/20/2018. (am)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SM Fencing & Energy Services. (Hughes, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Plaintiff's Complaint by SM Fencing & Energy Services. (Hughes, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SM Fencing & Energy Services.(Hughes, John)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob M. Karam. (rh)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jacob M. Karam (Filing fee $150, receipt number # 119000198) by Cameron Dopita. (Karam, Jacob) Modified on 11/13/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan S. MacLeod. (as) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct attorney name. (as)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cory D. Itkin. (rh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan S. MacLeod (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000055) by Cameron Dopita. (MacLeod, Ryan) Modified on 11/9/2018 to add receipt number (lh).
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cory D. Itkin (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000183) by Cameron Dopita. (Itkin, Cory) Modified on 11/8/2018 to add receipt number. (rh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SM Fencing & Energy Services. (cjs)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cameron Dopita. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/14/2018. (cjs)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SM Fencing & Energy Services (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000138) filed by Cameron Dopita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) Modified on 11/2/2018 to add receipt number. Regenerated NEF (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dopita v. SM Fencing & Energy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SM Fencing & Energy Services
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Dopita
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Ryan Scott MacLeod
Represented By: Cory Daniel Itkin
Represented By: Jacob Mansour Karam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?