Peluso v. Doeling

Appellant: Michael J. Peluso
Appellee: Gene W. Doeling
Case Number: 1:2018cv00224
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Designation of Record on Appeal re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues to be Presented)(rh)
November 8, 2018 Deadline Terminated. Deadline setting Appellant Brief due by 11/15/2018 is terminated. The deadline was set in error. (kmk)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Record on Appeal) Bankruptcy Court case number 17-07023. File received from Bankruptcy Court filed by Michael J. Peluso. Appellant Brief due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet (17-30413), #2 Bankruptcy Court Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet (17-07023))(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peluso v. Doeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael J. Peluso
Represented By: Timothy P. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gene W. Doeling
Represented By: Gene W. Doeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?