Dakota Gasification Company v. Sure Steel, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dakota Gasification Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sure Steel, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Steel Concepts LLC, Rice Lake Contracting Corp. and Robertson-Ceco II Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00226
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sure Steel, Inc.. Steel Concepts LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019 (Carlson, Tyler)
December 26, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sure Steel, Inc.. Robertson-Ceco II Corporation served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019 (Carlson, Tyler)
December 26, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sure Steel, Inc.. Rice Lake Contracting Corp. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019 (Carlson, Tyler)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 Third Party Summons Issued as to Rice Lake Contracting Corp., Robertson-Ceco II Corporation, Steel Concepts LLC. (cjs)
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Robertson-Ceco II Corporation, Steel Concepts LLC, Rice Lake Contracting Corp. filed by Sure Steel, Inc..(cjs)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION re Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Dakota Gasification Company. (Ramsey, Erica)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 (9 days) at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.(GD)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 7/31/2019. Discovery Motions due by 7/31/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/2/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/2/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 9/2/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/13/2019.(GD)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/14/2018. (GD) Modified on 12/18/2018 to note that minute entry is text only. NEF regenerated (lf).
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sure Steel, Inc. (rh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Ramsey on behalf of Dakota Gasification Company (Ramsey, Erica)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler S. Carlson on behalf of Sure Steel, Inc. (Carlson, Tyler)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sure Steel, Inc.. (Wolf, Troy)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sure Steel, Inc..(Wolf, Troy)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dakota Gasification Company. Sure Steel, Inc. served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 (Johnson, Scott)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dakota Gasification Company identifying Corporate Parent Basin Electric Power Cooperative for Dakota Gasification Company.. (Johnson, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sure Steel, Inc.. (am)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sure Steel, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000150) filed by Dakota Gasification Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakota Gasification Company v. Sure Steel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sure Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler S. Carlson
Represented By: Troy A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Gasification Company
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Scott G. Johnson
Represented By: Erica Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Steel Concepts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rice Lake Contracting Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Robertson-Ceco II Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?