Couture v. Neff et al
Plaintiff: Edward L. Couture
Defendant: Charles L. Neff and Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00228
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Charles L. Neff, Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C..(Hintz, Chad)
November 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Charles L. Neff answer due 1/4/2019; Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C. answer due 1/4/2019. (am)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C., Charles L. Neff. The Defendants shall have until 1/4/19 to answer the complaint. (NH)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Charles L. Neff, Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C.. (Hintz, Chad)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C.. (Hintz, Chad)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad J. Hintz on behalf of Charles L. Neff, Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C. (Hintz, Chad)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward L. Couture. Charles L. Neff served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018; Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018 (Novak, Anthony)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles L. Neff, Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C.. (cjs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles L. Neff, Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000175) filed by Edward L. Couture. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Williston Property Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C-Dore Property Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit E-Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couture v. Neff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Neff
Represented By: Chad J. Hintz
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neff, Eiken & Neff, P.C.
Represented By: Chad J. Hintz
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L. Couture
Represented By: Anthony J. Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?