Lawlar et al v. Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC

Plaintiff: Shirlene L. Lawlar and Richard J. Lawlar
Defendant: Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00231
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 12/17/2018. (GD) Modified on 1/10/2019 to add text only. (rm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. Chambers will initiate the call. Jury Trial (4 days) set for 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 8/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/3/2019. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/3/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 4/1/2019. Threshold Motions due by 4/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019.(GD)
November 26, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 ANSWER. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and refiled as ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #5 . (as)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC. (as)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint by Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC.(Bender, Lawrence) Modified on 11/26/2018 to restrict access. (as)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Ann Huckfeldt on behalf of Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC (Huckfeldt, Christina)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC from McKenzie Co. District Court, case number Unknown. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000209. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Floyd C. Robertson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit - 10/17/18 letter to Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - McKenzie Co. Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit D - Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawlar et al v. Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirlene L. Lawlar
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Lawlar
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?