Gross v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Gary Gross
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00232
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #9 Motion to Stay Action Due to Lapse of Appropriations (BG)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Action Due to Lapse of Appropriations by Social Security Administration. (Burkland, Melissa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to SSA served on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Social Security Administration served on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Temanson, Paul)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (rh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gary Gross. (am)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gary Gross. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/10/2018. (am)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gary Gross. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/29/2018. (cjs)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000212) filed by Gary Gross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gross
Represented By: Paul A. Temanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?