BNSF Railway Company v. Vossler

Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: David Vossler
Case Number: 1:2018cv00235
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Ferguson on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Ferguson, Sally)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
January 9, 2019 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by David Vossler.(Novak, Anthony)
November 20, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC for BNSF Railway Company.. (Warner, Stephen)
November 16, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to David Vossler. (am)
November 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against David Vossler (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000216) filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Warner
Represented By: Allison N. Krueger
Represented By: Sally J. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Vossler
Represented By: Anthony J. Novak
Represented By: Mark A. Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?