Jimenez Cabrera v. State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund
Plaintiff: Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera
Defendant: State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund
Case Number: 1:2018cv00242
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re briefing scheduling: Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction due by 2/1/2019. Plaintiff's response due by 3/1/2019. Upon receipt of this response, defendant shall have 7 days in which to reply. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG) Distributed on 12/13/2018 (cjs). Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct typo (lh).
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/13/2018. (BG) Distributed on 12/13/2018 (cjs).
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund (Anderson, Jacqueline)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund. (cjs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera re #3 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/18/2018. (js)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD) Distributed on 12/4/2018. (rh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund re #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Notice of Appearance (Anderson, Jacqueline)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund.(Anderson, Jacqueline)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline S. Anderson on behalf of State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund (Anderson, Jacqueline)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying #4 Motion to Continue; denying #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File (BG) Distributed on 11/26/2018 (cjs).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER: The clerks office shall seal Exhibit B to #1 Complaint filed by Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera as it contains sensitive personal information. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 11/21/2018 (cjs).
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Continue, MOTION for Extension by Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund. (cjs) Distributed on 11/21/2018 (cjs).
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/5/2018. (cjs)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000230) filed by Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera. (Attachments: #1 Workforce Safety and Insurance Filings, #2 *SEALED* Attachment B-Records Containing Personal Identifying Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Mailing Envelope)(cjs) Modified on 11/21/2018 to seal Attachment B per Order at 5 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez Cabrera v. State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Dakota Workforce Safety and Insurance Fund
Represented By: Jacqueline S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Jeaneth Jimenez Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?