Hogrefe et al v. Jeffrey, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Hogrefe and Tracie Hogrefe
Defendant: Garrison Lumber, Inc., Jeffrey, Inc., Farroh Roof Truss Co., J M Contracting, LLC, Velma Weishaar, Rod Baker Construction, Arlo Weishaar and Baker Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00249
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Garrison Lumber, Inc..(Rydell, Jessica)
January 15, 2019 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. is CANCELLED. (am)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER cancelling scheduling conference on 1/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Will be rescheduled at a later date.(GD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Baker Construction, LLC, Farroh Roof Truss Co., J M Contracting, LLC, Rod Baker Construction, Arlo Weishaar, Velma Weishaar. (cjs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against J M Contracting, LLC, Arlo Weishaar, Velma Weishaar, Rod Baker Construction, Baker Construction, LLC, Farroh Roof Truss Co. filed by Tracie Hogrefe, Raymond Hogrefe. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet)(cjs)
December 27, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Affidavit. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Certificate of Service at #12 . (cjs)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey, Inc. re #3 Notice of Appearance, #6 Answer to Complaint (cjs)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey, Inc.. (Beehler, Bradley)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mail upon Attorneys Flom & Rydell re #3 Notice of Appearance, #6 Answer to Complaint by Jeffrey, Inc.. (Beehler, Bradley) Modified on 12/27/2018 to restrict access (cjs).
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garrison Lumber, Inc.. (Rydell, Jessica)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Garrison Lumber, Inc..(Rydell, Jessica)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeffrey, Inc..(Beehler, Bradley)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Hogrefe. Jeffrey, Inc. served on 12/9/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (Brust, Mara)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Hogrefe. Garrison Lumber, Inc. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018 (Brust, Mara)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Beehler on behalf of Jeffrey, Inc. (Beehler, Bradley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Garrison Lumber, Inc., Jeffrey, Inc. (rh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garrison Lumber, Inc., Jeffrey, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000258) filed by Tracie Hogrefe, Raymond Hogrefe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogrefe et al v. Jeffrey, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Hogrefe
Represented By: Mara Brust
Represented By: L. Michael Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Hogrefe
Represented By: Mara Brust
Represented By: L. Michael Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Lumber, Inc.
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Represented By: Jessica M Rydell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farroh Roof Truss Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velma Weishaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Baker Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlo Weishaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?