USI Insurance Services LLC v. Bentz et al

Plaintiff: USI Insurance Services LLC
Defendant: Ashley Farthing, Daniel Werner, Lesley Bentz, Jared Fisher and Martin Fisher
Case Number: 1:2018cv00255
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties may commence discovery immediately. Defendants shall have until 2/8/2019 to file an answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to plaintiff's complaint. All parties are obligated to preserve emails and other relevant documents. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/2/2019 to correct caption) (am). Regenerated on 1/2/2019 (am).
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Status Conference held on 1/2/2019. (BG)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Thomas Solinger, I on behalf of USI Insurance Services LLC (Solinger, Shane)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. (BG)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying #6 Motion to Expedite without prejudice; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answers due by 1/11/2019. Plaintiffs may immediately serve subpoena on defendant's alleged new employer. The court shall conduct a status conference with the parties by telephone on 1/02/2019 at 2:00 PM. (BG)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Lesley Bentz, Ashley Farthing, Jared Fisher, Martin Fisher, Daniel Werner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence from Randall Bakke to Tim Purdon dated December 18, 2018)(Bakke, Randall)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Lesley Bentz, Ashley Farthing, Jared Fisher, Martin Fisher, Daniel Werner. (Bakke, Randall)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery by USI Insurance Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Discovery Requests to Defendant J Fisher, #2 Exhibit B, Discovery Requests to Defendant M Fisher, #3 Exhibit C, Discovery Requests to Defendant Werner, #4 Exhibit D, Discovery Requests to Defendant Bentz, #5 Exhibit E, Discovery Requests to Defendant Farthing, #6 Exhibit F, Discovery Requests to Non-Party Choice FInancial Group)(Clagg, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Fowlkes on behalf of USI Insurance Services LLC (Fowlkes, Christopher)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J. Bakke on behalf of Lesley Bentz, Ashley Farthing, Jared Fisher, Martin Fisher, Daniel Werner (Bakke, Randall)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USI Insurance Services LLC identifying Other Affiliate USI, Inc., Other Affiliate Onex USI Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Onex Corporation for USI Insurance Services LLC. (am)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lesley Bentz, Ashley Farthing, Jared Fisher, Martin Fisher, Daniel Werner. (am)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lesley Bentz, Ashley Farthing, Jared Fisher, Martin Fisher, Daniel Werner (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000295) filed by USI Insurance Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Werner Producer Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Jared Fisher Producer Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Bentz Confidentiality Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Farthing Confidentiality Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Martin Fisher Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - Emails dated November 9, 2018, #8 Exhibit G - Email dated November 8, 2018, #9 Exhibit H - Email dated November 16, 2018 from Mike Boub, #10 Exhibit I - Email dated November 9, 2018 from Leslie Bentz, #11 Exhibit J - Email dated November 27, 2018 from Ashley Farthing, #12 Exhibit K - Email dated November 28, 2018 from Ashley Farthing, #13 Exhibit L - Email dated November 28, 2018 from Bentz to Martin Fisher, #14 Exhibit M - Email dated November 20, 2018, #15 Exhibit N - Email dated November 29, 2018 from Werner, #16 Exhibit O - Resignation Letter Jared Fisher, #17 Exhibit P - Resignation Letter Dan Werner, #18 Exhibit Q - Resignation Letter Lesley Bentz, #19 Exhibit R - Resignation Letter Ashley Farthing, #20 Exhibit S - Resignation Letter Martin Fisher, #21 Exhibit T - Employment Offer Letter from Choice to Bentz, #22 Exhibit U - Employment Offer Letter from Choice to Farthing)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USI Insurance Services LLC v. Bentz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Farthing
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Bentz
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Fisher
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Fisher
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USI Insurance Services LLC
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Shane Thomas Solinger, I
Represented By: Christopher W. Fowlkes
Represented By: Jason T. Clagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?