Preder v. Baytex Energy USA LLC
Plaintiff: Donald Preder
Defendant: Baytex Energy USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00257
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 5/19/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). (BG)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 8/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019, except amendments re punitive damages due by 7/1/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 4/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2019. (BG)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 1/24/2019 is cancelled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 15, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerks office modified docket text to note Baytex Energy Ltd. and Baytex Energy Corp. as corporate parents. (js)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baytex Energy USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Baytex Energy Ltd. and Baytex Energy Corp. for Baytex Energy USA LLC. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 1/15/2019 to correct corporate parent name on docket. (js)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Baytex Energy USA LLC.(Grant, Nicholas)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr., as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. no longer assigned as presiding judge. (cjs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Baytex Energy USA LLC. (cjs)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donald Preder. Baytex Energy USA LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Dickson, Thomas) Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct waiver sent date. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Donald Preder. (cjs)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Donald Preder. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/21/2018. (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Baytex Energy USA LLC. (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baytex Energy USA LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000302) filed by Donald Preder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preder v. Baytex Energy USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baytex Energy USA LLC
Represented By: Shea Ashley Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Preder
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?