Avery v. E&M Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Braxton Avery
Defendant: Does 1-25 and E&M Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00258
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re final pretrial conference on 9/15/2020 at 2:30 p.m. before the Magistrate Judge by telephone. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 1/14/2019. (GD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. Chambers will initiate the call. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 (5 days) at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 12/15/2019. Discovery Motions due by 12/15/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/9/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/7/2020. Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 7/12/2019. Threshold Motions due by 6/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020.(GD)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the call.(GD)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by E&M Services, LLC.(Hughes, John)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of E&M Services, LLC (Hughes, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Braxton Avery. E&M Services, LLC served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Service- E&M)(Stubbs, Todd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Does 1-25, E&M Services, LLC. (cjs)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-25, E&M Services, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000303) filed by Braxton Avery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. E&M Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braxton Avery
Represented By: Todd Alan Stubbs
Represented By: Levi Gregory Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&M Services, LLC
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?