Wheeler v. North Dakota, State of et al
Plaintiff: LeRoy K. Wheeler
Defendant: North Dakota, State of, Hon. Doug Burgum and Doug Burgum
Case Number: 1:2018cv00265
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk) Distributed on 2/12/2019 (cjs).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying #11 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re: Appointment of Counsel. (NH) Distributed on 1/29/2019 (am).
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by LeRoy K. Wheeler re #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 1/16/2019. (rh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LeRoy K. Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr., no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh) Distributed on 1/15/19. (rh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by LeRoy K. Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Doug Burgum, North Dakota, State of filed by LeRoy K. Wheeler.(rh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to North Dakota State Penitentiary and LeRoy K. Wheeler re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (rh)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed to ND State Penitentiary and LeRoy K. Wheeler on 12/27/2018. (rh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to LeRoy K. Wheeler. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/31/2018. (rh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #3 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LeRoy K. Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. North Dakota, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Doug Burgum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Burgum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeRoy K. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?